Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Galaxy International Purchasin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hinton, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 146th Judicial District Court with Jones, Jack W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jack W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House146th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeNot Final |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | ||
September 14, 2021 | Expedited Case $250,000 or Less | ||
August 24, 2021 |
Unserved Service UNSERVED CITATION FOR STEPHANIE HINTON |
||
June 22, 2021 | Citation | ||
June 22, 2021 | CLERK'S COPY OF CIT- STEPHANIE HINTON- ABC LEGAL MAILED 6/23/21 | ||
June 03, 2021 | New Case Filed (OCA) | ||
June 03, 2021 |
Docket PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION BY LOWERY |
||
June 03, 2021 |
Docket CITATION SERVICE REQUEST FOR STEPHANIE HINTON |
||
June 03, 2021 |
Docket COVER LETTER FROM ABC LEGAL |
||
June 03, 2021 | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.