Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Henriques, Janalie Ann, against Haro, Luz, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 01, 2009 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions297 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time297 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) County of Napa |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Memo of Costs |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) County of: Napa |
|
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs 213710-Memorandum of Costs Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM OF COSTS [213710] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued 227110-Abstract: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ABSTRACT: ISSUED [227110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order 214210-Order Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ORDER [214210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Mar 25 2010 Type: 244220 - Judgment: Court Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.