Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Brown, Keisha, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Reed, Keith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, Keith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt Collection |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Receivership | ||
July 18, 2023 |
Order - All Other PL APPEARED FOR HEARING. MOTION FOR REC'R DENIED. COPY MAILED TO PL THIS DAY |
||
May 05, 2023 |
Docket MOTION TO BE SET FOR HEARING |
||
May 03, 2023 |
Proposed Order (e-File) Order Appointing Receiver |
||
May 03, 2023 |
Motion - No Fee (e-File) Application for Receivership |
||
November 15, 2021 |
Judgment PL'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED. JUDGMENT AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $2253.20; COURT COSTS $ 119.00; NO ATTY'S FEE; INTEREST 5% PER ANNUM, APPEAL DATE 12/6/21. JUDGMENT SCANNED AND COPY MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES |
||
November 15, 2021 | Cause Of Action | ||
November 12, 2021 |
Case Note MOTION PLACED IN BASKET FOR JUDGE TO REVIEW |
||
November 12, 2021 |
Motion - No Fee (e-File) Affidavit of non military status |
||
November 12, 2021 |
Motion - No Fee (e-File) Motion for Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.