Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Jack W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce: Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Modification
Judge: Jones, Jack W |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE BY APRIL WILLIAMS | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Modify UNSIGNED ORDER MODIFYING THE PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Post-Judgment: Modification - Other (DC) (OCA) PETITION TO MODIFY THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP BY JASON MICHAEL WILLIAMS PRO SE |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket SET UP WITH AUSTIN WHITE FORM SDU#0013891388 (OAG WILL RESOLVE) |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Converted Case Dispostion Event - Case Clock Stopped | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket **- file folder returned- AMS |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER FOR SUPPORT SIGNED BY JUDGE JONES ON 6/11/19 |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY DATED 6/11/19 | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE JONES ON 6/11/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.