Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Courtney Michelle Tindle, Carlos Rafael Rodriguez Jr, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Carlos Rafael Rodriguez Jr, Trevion Rafael Rodriguez, Courtney Michelle Tindle, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 264.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship By Ag |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House264 |
Case Outcome TypeNonjury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVED CIT TO COURTNEY MICHELLE TINDLE 12/10/20 | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERKS COPY OF SERVICE ISSUED TO COURTNEY TINDLE | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | SERVED CIT TO CARLOS RAFAEL RODRIGUEZ JR | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERKS COPY OF SERVICE ISSUED TO CARLOS | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY GENERAL COVER LETTER | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY BY JUDGE NELSON 02/20/19 | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | **- file folder returned- CTAG | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to CTAG | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY BY JUDGE NELSON 01/23/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.