Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Torres-Hooks, Mitzi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hooks, Carlos Asante, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Jack W. Jones, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce: Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | ||
September 05, 2023 | RETURNED COORDINATOR MAIL TO MITZI | ||
July 06, 2022 |
Final Decree of Divorce UNSIGNED BY JUDGE FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE |
||
July 06, 2022 |
Copy Request (copies) COPY REQUEST OF THE WAIVER OF SERVICE BY MITZI |
||
July 05, 2022 | WAIVER OF SERVICE BY CARLOS | ||
December 06, 2018 | New Case Filed (OCA) | ||
December 06, 2018 |
Docket STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS OR AN APPEAL BOND IN JUSTICE COURT |
||
December 06, 2018 | Cause Of Action | ||
December 06, 2018 |
Docket ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE BY MITZI TORRES HOOKS |
||
December 06, 2018 |
Docket CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.