Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Szakel, Jason, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Tidwell, Marcus, Tidwell, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Jack W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2018 |
CategoryInjury/Damage: Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | RETURNED COORDINATOR MAIL DISMISSAL JUDGMENT | ||
February 16, 2023 | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution | ||
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Jones, Jack W |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED COORDINATOR MAIL TO JASON | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | New Case Filed (OCA) | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION BY JASON SZAKEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.