Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Romain, Keri, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Henry, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Bell County. This case was filed in Bell County Superior Courts with Jack W. Jones, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryModification Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Enter Order | ||
April 25, 2023 |
Docket Entry P appeared with atty Biebas - R appeared with atty Llamas - proceeded with final mod hearing - Rule invoked - P (mom) testified - P rests - R (dad) testified - R rests - ct orders that parties re JMC, R has primary, P has expanded SPO, P to pay C/S retro to 12/22 at guideline amt, P to provide health ins - JJ |
||
April 25, 2023 |
Modification 2 hrs |
||
April 21, 2023 |
Judge's Docket Sheet DOCKET SHEET |
||
April 21, 2023 |
Order for Continuance ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE SIGNED BY JUDGE ADAMS 04/19/2023 |
||
April 21, 2023 | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | ||
April 21, 2023 |
Modification 2 hrs |
||
April 20, 2023 | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY LLAMAS SD SAW | ||
April 20, 2023 |
Order UNSIGNED ORDER FOR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - PER SD JUDGE NOT SIGNING AT THIS TIME |
||
March 22, 2023 |
Amended Filing (e-File) FIRST AMENDED COUNTERPETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP BY LLAMAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.