Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rivera, Adam Rue, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Guerrero, Maria Guadalupe Rojas, in the jurisdiction of Bell County. This case was filed in Bell County Superior Courts with Jack W. Jones, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryModification Custody |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | ||
March 06, 2019 | DOCKET ENTRY 2/28/19 | ||
March 06, 2019 |
Docket **- file folder returned- SS |
||
March 01, 2019 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO SS |
||
February 28, 2019 |
Temporary Hearing Lepak conflict/jones to hear TEMPORARY HEARING - BY BOTH PARTIES MOTION FOR DRUG SCREENING - BY LIBERSKY |
||
February 27, 2019 |
Docket NOTICE OF SETTING DATED 2/26/19 |
||
February 27, 2019 |
Docket SERVED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON NOELIA RIPOLI 02/26/2019 |
||
February 27, 2019 |
Docket MOTION FOR DRUG SCREENING BY LIBERSKY CC SET |
||
February 27, 2019 |
Docket UNSIGNED ORDER ON MOTION FOR DRUG SCREEN JUDGE TO REVIEW IN COURT |
||
February 27, 2019 |
Docket **- file folder given to CTB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.