Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cecelia Rose Mungia, Ranferi Lopez Mondragon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ava Nicole Mondragon, Cecelia Rose Mondragon, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 146.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House146 |
Case Outcome TypeNonjury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP BY | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER BY LAUGHLIN | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE TO CECELIA ROSE MUNGIA | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | COPY REQUEST FROM RANFERI MONDRAGON- IN PERSON | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- RECO | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to RECO | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE JEZEK | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to CW | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to VIEW | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- PRC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.