Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Snyder, Elizabeth Garcia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Snyder, Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Jack W. Jones, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2015 |
CategoryProtective Orders - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJuly 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | ||
June 01, 2021 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STOR |
||
April 22, 2015 | DOCKET ENTRY JUDGE JONES 4/2/15 | ||
April 22, 2015 |
Docket **- file folder returned- CM |
||
April 17, 2015 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CM |
||
April 17, 2015 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- PK |
||
April 10, 2015 |
Docket **- file folder given to PK |
||
April 06, 2015 |
Docket **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CM |
||
April 02, 2015 |
Docket RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY LAUGHLIN |
||
April 02, 2015 |
Docket MOTION TO VACATE PROTECTIVE ORDER BY LAUGHLIN PK SAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.