Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Duskie, Steven J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2015 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D: Establishment |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Mtn to Confirm Child Support and Medical Support Arrears Judge: Duskie, Steven J |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (e-File) JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT AND MEDICAL SUPPORT ARREARAGE SIGNED BY JUDGE DUSKIE 08/18/22 |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver (e-File) WAIVER OF SERVICE BY JESSICA LYNN BURNETT |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Post-Judgment: Modification - Other (DC) (OCA) | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - No Fee (e-File) MOTION TO CONFIRM CHILD SUPPORT AND MEDICAL SUPPORT ARREARAGE/NOTICE OF HEARING 08/25/22 SIGNED BY JUDGE DUSKIE 07/13/22 |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Request (copies) COPY REQUEST RCVD FROM JESSICA BURNETT - IN PERSON |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Request (copies) COPY REQUEST BY JONATHAN BURNETT - mailed 05/27/2022 |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AND ORDER IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED BY JUDGE DUSKIE 05/25/22 Judge: Duskie, Steven J |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | BVS FORM SENT TO AUSTIN | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry P appeared with atty Slay and testified re divorce and children - R appeared pro se and testified - divorce granted on terms in agreed decree - change R's last name - JJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.