Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
O'Brien, Ronnie D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against O'Brien, Seann P., in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Gauntt, John T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2015 |
CategoryProtective Orders - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION TO TERMINATE INCOME WITHHOLDING | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | WITHHOLDING ORDER REQUEST FORM TO DFAS | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDRESS UPDATE DATED 04/09/18 SENT IN BY SEANN P | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER FOR SUPPORT JUDGE GAUNTT | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET ENTRY 03 26 2018 | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | **- file folder returned- KRM | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC RELTATIONS ORDER MILITARY RETIREMENT | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to KRM | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY 03 23 2018 | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.