Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marketta Shamea Smith, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Alfonso Anderson, Aiden Mark Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 169.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship By Ag |
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House169 |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUIT FOR MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT ORDER AND MOTION | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY GENERAL COVER LETTER | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY REQUEST BY MARKETTA SMITH MAILED 9/16/19 | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- RECO | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to RECO | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER (ESTABLISHING THE | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ESTABLISHING PATERNITY | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | HEALTH INSURANCE AVAILABILITY FORM | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | APPROVAL OF CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER AND WAIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.