Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shequilla Byrd-Harding, Shequilla Tamiko Byrd-Harding, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Shawn Michael Harding, Michael Harding-Byrd, Harding Shawn Michael, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 426.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2015 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship By Ag |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House426 |
Case Outcome TypeNonjury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | **- file folder returned- STOR | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR PROVE-UP OF AGREED DIVORCE WITH | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE BY SHEQUILLA | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF INABILTIY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STOR | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- RECO | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to RECO | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ENFORCING CHILD SUPPORT AND MEDICAL SUPPORT | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO CE | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to CTAG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.