Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Layne Marie Sims, Layne Marie Blake, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Nicholas Coleman Allison, Arreya Marie Sims, Arreya Marie Allison, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 426.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2011 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship By Ag |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House426 |
Case Outcome TypeNonjury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVED CIT TO NICHOLAS COLEMAN ALLISON 03/12/21 | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | **- file folder returned- STOR | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVED CIT TO LAYNE MARIE BLAKE 03/10/21 | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS COPY OF SERVICE ISSUED TO NICHOLAS ALLISON | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS COPY OF SERVICE ISSUED TO LAYNE BLAKE | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY GENERAL COVER LETTER | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SUIT FOR MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT ORDER AND MOTION | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO STOR | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FILE ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF WITHHOLDING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.