Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Jack W. Jones, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2011 |
CategoryOther Parent-Child - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | ||
June 05, 2013 |
Docket TRIAL SUBPOENA RETURN OF SERVICE FOR RICHARD TRAMP |
||
June 05, 2013 |
Docket TRIAL SUBPOENA RETURN OF SERVICE FOR SHARON BRANK |
||
March 04, 2013 |
Docket COVER LETTER BY HUSEBY |
||
March 04, 2013 |
Docket REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION OF SAN JUANITA TREVINO, LCSW JANUARY 18, 2013 |
||
June 30, 2011 |
Docket **- file folder returned- CM |
||
June 30, 2011 |
Docket DNA TEST REPORT |
||
June 30, 2011 |
Docket **- file folder given to CM |
||
June 29, 2011 |
Docket **- file folder given to CTB |
||
June 17, 2011 |
Docket MOTION TO ENTRY ORDER BY BLYTHE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.