Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rivera, Daniel, Iv, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Barcinas, Maria Pamela, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Duskie, Steven J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDuskie, Steven J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryCustody Of Visitation |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Motion for Withdrawal | ||
November 13, 2023 |
Order for Withdrawal of Counsel UNSIGNED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY VJ SAW |
||
November 13, 2023 | COVER LETTER | ||
October 03, 2023 | RETURNED GREEN CARD TO DANIEL | ||
September 20, 2023 |
Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDINGS BY TISDALE - VJ SAW |
||
August 28, 2023 |
Motion to Withdraw MOTION FOR WITHDRAW OF ATTORNEY BY TISDALE - VJ SAW |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Docket Entry 02/22/2023 426th case (in Jury Trial) Heard by 169th by CSB Set for HTEO Whorley and Tisdale appeared will submit and efile agreed order not in efiling yet either Judge can sign agreed order upon receipt //CSB |
||
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Enter Order
Judge: Duskie, Steven J |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order UNSIGNED TEMPORARY ORDERS - VJ SAW |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order UNSIGNED TEMPORARY ORDERS VJ SAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.