Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts with Jones, Jack W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jack W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce: Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry P appeared with atty Opara and testified re divorce and children - R was given notice of hearing and did not appear - divorce granted, prop and debts to party in possn, P is SMC, R is PC with access to children at P's discretion, no C/S because R is in prison, change P's last name - JJ |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SIGNED BY JUDGE JONES 06/29/22 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Jones, Jack W |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED COORDINATOR MAIL SENT TO GILBERT FLORES | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer WRITTEN ANSWER BY GILBERT FLORES |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Jones, Jack W |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Served Service RETURNED SERVED SERVICE TO GILBERT 5/11/22 |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S COPY OF CN/R ON GILBERT - BOX 41 | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE TO GILBERT WAYNE FLORES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.