Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garcia, Sergio, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Public Defender, against Garcia, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2012 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.