Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Thill, Jordana R, filed a(n) Other case against Paulson, Justin G, in the jurisdiction of Brookings County, SD, . Brookings County, SD Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBrookings County, SD |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT ORDER FILING DATA FORM (CONFIDENTIAL) | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT | |
April 04, 2023 | Hearing | Motions Hearing | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CHANGE OF VENUE | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.