Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyes, Criso, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reyes, Tiffani, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Accounts Receivable- Fiscal | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.