Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robles, Dora, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Tafoya, Salvador Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2012 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Petition | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.