Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morrow, Britanya Nicole Almazan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morrow, Steven Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Respondent's 191 Filed | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.