Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sousa, Cathleen Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Giron, Anthony P, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.