Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Joanna R Smith Bail Bonds, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Chand, Salesh, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2012 |
CategoryBusiness Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Review re Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 05, 2012Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 20, 2013Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant
Date: December 05, 2012Satisfaction of Judgment - Full
Date: September 11, 2015SC Judgment: Uncontested
Date: February 18, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Uncontested | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing Small Claims Hearing |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Court's Motion to Dismiss Court's Motion to Dismiss |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.