Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fremont Bank, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Speiller, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2013 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Subsequent Accounting: Petition
Date: November 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subsequent Accounting
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subsequent Accounting
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subsequent Accounting
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subsequent Accounting
Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Accounting Review Hearing Accounting Review Hearing Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing With Proof of Service: Estates/Trusts | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Subsequent Accounting: Petition 4TH ACCOUNT AND REPORT Subsequent Accounting: Petition |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Accounting Review Hearing Accounting Review Hearing Judge: Speiller, Stacy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.