Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Cooper, Michael Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2013 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice - Registration of Foreign Support Order | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.