Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Furtado, Timothy, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against State Of Rhode Island And Providence Plantations, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa E. Darigan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
CategoryRule 5A Petition-Superior Court Rules Of Criminal Procedure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Hearing |
Bail Hearing
Judge: Rekas Sloan, Associate Justice Linda |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Note (Remanded) KSC | |
September 20, 2022 | Hearing |
Bail Hearing
Judge: Rekas Sloan, Associate Justice Linda |
|
September 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Bail Hearing
Judge: Rekas Sloan, Associate Justice Linda |
|
August 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Bail Hearing
Judge: Darigan, Associate Justice Melissa E. |
|
August 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Determination of Attorney Defense Attorney Entered Judge: Nugent, Associate Justice Stephen P. |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | for Bail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.