Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Book Account case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Beauchamp, Brenda L, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2019 |
CategoryBook Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Filed | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.