Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
New England Institute Of Technology, filed a(n) Book Account case represented by Laing, Lynda L., against Sergi, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Jeffrey A. Lanphear presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryBook Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Rule 7 Motion to Attach Wages Passed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Remote Hearing Completed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Form | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | for Default Judgment | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.