Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Book Account case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Beck, Barbara A, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Jeffrey A. Lanphear presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
CategoryBook Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Attach | |
July 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Rule 7 Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | 7 Motion to Attach Wages | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Form | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.