Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Franks, Dawn, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Ennis, John B, against Fci Lender Services, Inc., represented by Kiser, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Jeffrey A. Lanphear presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeClosed-Non-Trial-Unassigned-Case Dismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
September 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Stipulation to Enter Completed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
August 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Preliminary Injunction Conference Completed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
August 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Vacate Conference Completed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
July 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Remote Hearing Completed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
May 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Remote Hearing Completed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
May 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Vacate Heard and Continued Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.