Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Action case represented by Hall, Joseph M, against Bagaglia, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Action |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeClosed-Non-Trial-Unassigned-Case Dismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | to Dismiss | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.