Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Book Account case represented by Hammer, Scott L., Lyon, Neill B., against Doyle, Gail, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Jeffrey A. Lanphear presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryBook Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Rule 7 Motion to Attach Wages Passed Judge: Van Couyghen, Associate Justice Brian |
|
January 07, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Rule 7 Motion to Attach Wages
Judge: Van Couyghen, Associate Justice Brian |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | 7 Motion to Attach Wages | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Form | |
January 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Rule 7 Motion to Attach Wages Heard and Granted Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | 7 Motion to Attach Wages | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Form | |
May 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing on Rule 7 Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court Judge: Licht, Associate Justice Richard |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Form | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | 7 Motion to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.