Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pasiakos, George, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Gregor, Clovis, Lefebvre, Christopher M., against Bmw Of North America, Llc, represented by Freel, John D., Demaria, Gerald C, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Stephen P. Nugent presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2011 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Denied Judge: McGuirl, Associate Justice Susan E. |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | - Rejection of Arbitration Award Filed - $300.00 | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | - Award Filed | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | - Arbitrator's 1st Status Report | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | - Arbitrator Appointment Accepted | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | of Arbitrator Filed | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | - Proposed Arbitration Selection | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Designated to Arbitration | |
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | - Initial Fee/Plaintiff Paid - $100.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.