Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wilmot, Colleen J, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Parise, Arthur D, against Balise T Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Jeffrey A. Lanphear presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2009 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Filed During Discovery | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Filed, Case Settled | |
June 30, 2009 | Hearing |
Preliminary Injunction Passed Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Passed | |
June 16, 2009 | Hearing |
Preliminary Injunction Continued by Agreement Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Continued by Agreement | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Filing Fee | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Applied | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Data Entry | |
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.