Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bowen, Helena, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Ruggiero, Daniel Goldsmith, against Fiorie Pontiac, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2009 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Filed, Case Settled | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Filed During Discovery | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | of Dismissal Filed | |
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint Filed | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Answer | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | to Amend Answer | |
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Filed Extension of Time | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.