Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Finance Corporation Ii, filed a(n) Book Account case represented by Hammer, Scott L., Gouveia, Matthew, against Pierce, William, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Jeffrey A. Lanphear presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryBook Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Filed | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
February 26, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Heard and Granted Judge: Gallo, Associate Justice Bennett R. |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Granted | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Attach | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | of Attachment Filed | |
September 28, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Heard and Granted Judge: Lanphear, Associate Justice Jeffrey A. |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.