Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Walsh, Brenda G, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
February 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
June 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.