Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Quinn, Adam, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
April 15, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Granted | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
June 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.