Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Lamaire, George J, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2023 |
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered | |
June 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Granted | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
August 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.