Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Card, George L Iv, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.