Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Benoit, Lori, represented by Shealy, Elizabeth W, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed without Prejudice | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Filed | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.