Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Camara, Marion, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Entered | |
April 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
July 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Document Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.