Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Scharnagle, Catherine Rose, Corona Jamiel, Carolina Aimee, Hartley, Michael James, Fournier, Jennifer Marie, against Taylor, Quenta, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Entered | |
March 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.