Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Ferreira, Lisa, represented by Taylor, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed | |
October 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.