Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Frank, Lisa M, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Attach Wages Granted Under Rule of Court |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | to Attach Wages | |
January 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Concluded Judge: O'Neill, Magistrate J. Patrick |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Granted | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.