Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hammer, Scott L., against Distefano, Steven, represented by Taylor, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed with Prejudice | |
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment At the request of Plaintiff's Attorney Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed Agreement For Payment | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Entered | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | for Summary Judgment | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | of Appearance | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.