Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Solomon, Julie B., against Scullin, Michael G, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Kent County, RI, . Kent County, RI Superior Courts with Melissa DuBose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKent County, RI |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Trial Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | for Entry of Default Filed | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Served | |
January 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Alternative Service Hearing Concluded Judge: DuBose, Melissa |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Entered | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Granted | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | for Alternative Service | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Book Account Filed | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.